Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/21/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 06/22/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/22/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/22/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 06/23/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/23/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/23/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/28/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/28/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/28/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/06/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/07/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/08/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/08/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/11/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/11/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 07/11/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/11/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/12/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 07/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/15/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/15/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/18/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/18/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/18/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/18/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/18/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/19/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/19/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/19/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/20/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/21/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/21/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/21/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/21/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/21/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/25/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/26/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/28/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/28/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 08/01/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/05/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/05/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 08/16/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 08/16/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/19/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 08/23/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 08/30/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/30/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 08/30/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/07/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/07/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/07/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/08/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/13/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/13/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/14/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/14/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/20/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 09/22/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/22/2011