Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/12/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/20/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/20/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/20/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/26/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/26/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/26/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/27/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/27/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/27/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/27/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/27/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/28/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/07/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/20/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 09/20/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/22/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/29/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/15/2012