Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 06/21/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/21/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/05/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/05/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/05/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/20/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/20/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/01/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/01/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/14/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/14/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/04/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/04/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/04/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/04/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/04/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 10/04/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/04/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 10/13/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/13/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/13/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/01/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/01/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 12/01/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/01/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/01/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/01/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/01/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/01/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/01/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/27/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/27/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/27/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/27/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/09/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/09/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/09/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/01/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/01/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/01/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/01/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/18/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/25/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/17/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/17/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/17/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/19/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/19/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/19/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 09/21/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/05/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/16/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/16/2012