There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fire Grants Reauthorization Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend sections 33 and 34 of the Federal Fire Prevention and Control Act of 1974, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/22/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/28/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/22/2011Referred to House Homeland Security
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/2011Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/2011Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/2011Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1156)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/22/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/01/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 08/01/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 08/01/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 10/05/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/05/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/05/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/05/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/07/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/07/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 04/26/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/07/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/07/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology06/22/2011 Referred to
House Homeland Security06/22/2011 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Communications06/28/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2269. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/22/2011)

Fire Grants Reauthorization Act of 2011 - Amends the Federal Fire Prevention and Control Act of 1974 to reauthorize through FY2016 the Federal Emergency Management Agency's (FEMA's) Assistance to Firefighters Grants (AFG) program and the Staffing for Adequate Fire and Emergency Response (SAFER) program. Modifies the scope of the AFG program, including by permitting the use of grant funds for volunteer, non-fire service emergency medical services organizations and for certifying fire and building inspectors employed by a fire department or serving as a volunteer building inspector with a fire department. Prohibits providing program funds to the Association of Community Organizations for Reform Now (ACORN) or any of its affiliates, subsidiaries, or allied organizations.

Increases: (1) funding for fire prevention and firefighter safety programs, and (2) maximum AFG grant amounts. Lowers matching and maintenance of expenditure requirements and authorizes the Administrator of FEMA to waive or reduce such requirements for applicants facing demonstrated economic hardship. Revises grant allocation requirements to require 25% of grant amounts for a fiscal year to be allocated to each of: (1) career fire departments, (2) volunteer fire departments, and (3) combination fire departments. Requires remaining amounts to be awarded on a competitive basis among such fire departments. Revises grant limits based on jurisdiction populations. Sets forth new limits on awards to state fire training academies. Limits grant amounts used to obtain training to training that complies with applicable national voluntary consensus standards.

Amends SAFER program provisions to: (1) limit the period of program grants to three years; (2) require grantees to commit to retaining firefighters hired for the entire grant period, with an economic hardship exception; and (3) limit to 80% the portion of the cost of hiring firefighters for each fiscal year that may be provided under a grant.

Directs the Administrator of FEMA to make grants directly to career, volunteer, and combination fire departments for the purpose of increasing the number of firefighters to help communities meet industry minimum standards and attain 24-hour staffing to provide adequate protection from fire and fire-related hazards and to fulfill traditional missions of fire departments that antedate the creation of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS).

Authorizes the Administrator of the United States Fire Administration, in conjunction with the National Fire Protection Association, to conduct and report to Congress on a study to: (1) define the current roles and activities associated with the fire services on a national, state, regional, and local level: (2) identify the equipment, staffing, and training required to fulfill such roles and activities; (3) conduct an assessment to identify gaps between what fire departments currently possess and what they require on a national and state-by-state basis; and (4) measure the impact of the AFG program in meeting the needs and filling the gaps identified.