Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/22/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/01/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 08/01/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 08/01/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 10/05/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/05/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/05/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/05/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/07/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/07/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 04/26/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/07/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/07/2012