Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/14/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/27/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/28/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/08/2011