Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/13/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/15/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/15/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/15/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/15/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 09/23/2011