Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/11/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/18/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/29/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/10/2012