Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/13/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/13/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/09/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/09/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/15/2012