Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/04/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/11/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/11/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/11/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/13/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/01/2011