There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Caring for Military Kids with Autism Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to provide for certain treatment of autism under TRICARE.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/22/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/19/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/22/2011Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/24/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/24/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/31/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/01/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/01/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 11/17/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/18/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/05/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/08/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 12/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/12/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 12/16/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/19/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/20/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/20/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/09/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/14/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/14/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/14/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/14/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/14/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/16/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/16/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/17/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/27/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/27/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/27/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/27/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/01/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/06/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/20/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/16/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/18/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/19/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/25/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/07/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/30/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/22/2011 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel07/19/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2288.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2288. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/22/2011)

Caring for Military Kids with Autism Act - Requires the autism spectrum disorder treatment authorized for dependents in uniformed services facilities under TRICARE (a Department of Defense [DOD] managed health care system) to include behavioral health treatment, including applied behavior analysis, when prescribed by a physician.