Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/24/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/24/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/31/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/01/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/01/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 11/17/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/18/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/05/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/08/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 12/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/12/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 12/16/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/19/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/20/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/20/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/09/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/14/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/14/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/14/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/14/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/14/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/16/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/16/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/17/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/27/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/27/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/27/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/27/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/01/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/06/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/20/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/16/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/18/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/19/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/25/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/07/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/30/2012