Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 08/01/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/29/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/09/2012