Text: H.R.2297 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-143 (07/09/2012)

 
[112th Congress Public Law 143]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 989]]

          DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA SOUTHWEST WATERFRONT DEVELOPMENT

[[Page 126 STAT. 990]]

Public Law 112-143
112th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To promote the development of the Southwest waterfront in the District 
   of Columbia, and for other purposes. <<NOTE: July 9, 2012 -  [H.R. 
                                2297]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. PROMOTING DEVELOPMENT OF SOUTHWEST WATERFRONT.

    (a) Updated Description of Property.--Section 1 of the Act entitled 
``An Act to authorize the Commissioners of the District of Columbia on 
behalf of the United States to transfer from the United States to the 
District of Columbia Redevelopment Land Agency title to certain real 
property in said District'', approved September 8, 1960 (sec. 6-321.01, 
D.C. Official Code), is amended by striking all that follows the colon 
and inserting the following: ``The property located within the bounds of 
the site the legal description of which is the Southwest Waterfront 
Project Site (dated October 8, 2009) under Exhibit A of the document 
titled `Intent to Clarify the Legal Description in Furtherance of Land 
Disposition Agreement', as filed with the Recorder of Deeds on October 
27, 2009 as Instrument Number 2009116776.''.
    (b) Clarification of Method of Transfer.--Section 1 of such Act 
(sec. 6-321.01, D.C. Official Code) is amended by inserting ``by one or 
more quitclaim deeds'' immediately after ``to transfer''.
    (c) Clarification of Relation to Master Development Plan.--Section 2 
of such Act (sec. 6-321.02, D.C. Official Code) is amended--
            (1) by striking ``an urban renewal plan'' and inserting ``a 
        master plan''; and
            (2) by striking ``such urban renewal plan'' and inserting 
        ``such master plan''.

    (d) Expanding Permitted Dispositions and Uses of Certain Property.--
Section 4 of such Act (sec. 6-321.04, D.C. Official Code) is amended to 
read as follows:
    ``Sec. 4.  The Agency is hereby authorized, in accordance with the 
District of Columbia Redevelopment Act of 1945 and section 1, to lease 
or sell to a redevelopment company or other lessee or purchaser such 
real property as may be transferred to the Agency under the authority of 
this Act.''.
    (e) Repeal of Reversion.--
            (1) Repeal.--Section 5 of such Act (sec. 6-321.05, D.C. 
        Official Code) is repealed.
            (2) Conforming amendment.--Section 3 of such Act (sec. 6-
        321.03, D.C. Official Code) is amended by striking ``Subject

[[Page 126 STAT. 991]]

        to the provisions of section 5 of this Act, the'' and inserting 
        ``The''.

    (f) Clarification of Role of District of Columbia as Successor in 
Interest.--Section 8 of such Act (sec. 6-321.08, D.C. Official Code) is 
amended by striking ``the terms'' and all that follows and inserting 
``any reference to the `Agency' shall be deemed to be a reference to the 
District of Columbia as the successor in interest to the Agency.''.
SEC. 2. CLARIFICATION OF PERMITTED ACTIVITIES AT MUNICIPAL FISH 
                    MARKET.

    The Act entitled ``An Act Authorizing the Commissioners of the 
District of Columbia to make regulations respecting the rights and 
privileges of the fish wharf'', approved March 19, 1906 (sec. 37-205.01, 
D.C. Official Code), is amended--
            (1) by striking ``operate as a municipal fish wharf and 
        market'' and inserting ``operate as a market and for such other 
        uses as the Mayor determines to be appropriate'';
            (2) by striking ``, and said wharf shall constitute the sole 
        wharf for the landing of fish and oysters for sale in the 
        District of Columbia''; and
            (3) by striking ``operation of said municipal fish wharf and 
        market'' and inserting ``operation of said market''.
SEC. 3. MAINE LOBSTERMAN MEMORIAL.

    (a) In General.--Except as provided in subsection (b), nothing in 
this Act or any amendment made by this Act authorizes the removal, 
destruction, or obstruction of the Maine Lobsterman Memorial which is 
located near Maine Avenue in the District of Columbia as of the date of 
enactment of this Act.
    (b) Movement of Memorial.--The Maine Lobsterman Memorial referred to 
in subsection (a) may be moved from its location as of the date of the 
enactment of this Act to another location on the Southwest waterfront 
near Maine Avenue in the District of Columbia if at that location there 
would be a clear, unimpeded pedestrian pathway and line of sight from 
the Memorial to the water.
SEC. 4. PROJECT FOR NAVIGATION, WASHINGTON CHANNEL, DISTRICT OF 
                    COLUMBIA.

    (a) In General.--The portion of the project for navigation of the 
Corps of Engineers at Potomac River, Washington Channel, District of 
Columbia, as authorized by the Act of August 30, 1935 (chapter 831; 49 
Stat. 1028), and described in subsection (b), is deauthorized.
    (b) Description of Project.--The deauthorized portion of the project 
for navigation is as follows: Beginning at Washington Harbor Channel 
Geometry Centerline of the 400-foot-wide main navigational ship channel, 
Centerline Station No. 103+73.12, coordinates North 441948.20, East 
1303969.30, as stated and depicted on the Condition Survey Anacostia, 
Virginia, Washington and Magazine Bar Shoal Channels, Washington, D.C., 
Sheet 6 of 6, prepared by the United States Army Corps of Engineers, 
Baltimore district, July 2007; thence departing the aforementioned 
centerline traveling the following courses and distances: N. 40 degrees 
10 minutes 45 seconds E., 200.00 feet to a point, on the outline of said 
400-foot-wide channel thence binding on said outline the following 3 
courses and distances: S. 49 degrees 49 minutes 15 seconds E.,

[[Page 126 STAT. 992]]

1,507.86 feet to a point, thence; S. 29 degrees 44 minutes 42 seconds 
E., 2,083.17 feet to a point, thence; S. 11 degrees 27 minutes 04 
seconds E., 363.00 feet to a point, thence; S. 78 degrees 32 minutes 56 
seconds W., 200.00 feet to a point binding on the centerline of the 400-
foot-wide main navigational channel at computed Centerline Station No. 
65+54.31, coordinates North 438923.9874, East 1306159.9738, thence; 
continuing with the aforementioned centerline the following courses and 
distances: N. 11 degrees 27 minutes 04 seconds W., 330.80 feet to a 
point, Centerline Station No. 68+85.10, thence; N. 29 degrees 44 minutes 
42 seconds W., 2,015.56 feet to a point, Centerline Station No. 
89+00.67, thence; N. 49 degrees 49 minutes 15 seconds W., 1,472.26 feet 
to the point of beginning, the area in total containing a computed area 
of 777,284 square feet or 17.84399 acres of riparian water way.

    Approved July 9, 2012.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 2297:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

SENATE REPORTS: No. 112-154 (Comm. on Homeland Security and Governmental 
Affairs).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD:
                                                        Vol. 157 (2011):
                                    Dec. 6, considered and passed House.
                                                        Vol. 158 (2012):
                                    Mar. 29, considered and passed 
                                        Senate, amended.
                                    June 26, House concurred in Senate 
                                        amendment.

                                  <all>

Share This