Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/07/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/07/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/19/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/24/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 01/24/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/08/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/08/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/15/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/15/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/17/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/01/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/01/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/01/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/15/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/15/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/15/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/29/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/04/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/12/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/15/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/05/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/26/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/03/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/22/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/11/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/11/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/11/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/21/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/25/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/29/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/29/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/07/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/07/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/07/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/12/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/21/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/21/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/22/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/23/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/06/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/06/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/06/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/03/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/08/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/08/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/03/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/15/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/27/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/07/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 05/30/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/01/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/01/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/28/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/28/2012