Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/24/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/07/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/11/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/12/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/25/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 08/01/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/14/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/22/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/06/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/12/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/04/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/10/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/27/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/25/2012