Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/23/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/08/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/13/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/13/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/01/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/07/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/16/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/28/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/28/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/26/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/11/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/25/2012