Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/07/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/22/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/09/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/21/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/22/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/29/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/18/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/23/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/25/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/25/2012