Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/05/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/13/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/14/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/19/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/01/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 12/01/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/01/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/01/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/01/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 12/01/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 12/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/01/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 12/01/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/01/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/02/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 12/02/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 12/02/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 12/02/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/02/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/02/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 12/02/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/02/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/02/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 12/08/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 12/09/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/09/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/09/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/09/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/09/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 12/09/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 12/09/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/09/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/09/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/09/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/09/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/09/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/09/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/09/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/09/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/09/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/09/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 12/09/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/09/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/09/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/09/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/09/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/09/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/14/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/14/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/15/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/23/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 02/01/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/28/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/28/2012