Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/23/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/24/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/11/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/06/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/07/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/07/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/07/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/10/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/10/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/15/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/15/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/15/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/29/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/31/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/05/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/05/2012