Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/21/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/08/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/09/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/09/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/19/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/20/2012