Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/08/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 07/13/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/27/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/08/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/18/2012