Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/23/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/24/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/24/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/08/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/08/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/08/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2012