Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/24/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/24/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/24/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/25/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/17/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/27/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 12/05/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/08/2011