Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/23/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/07/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/20/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/20/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/15/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/04/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/24/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew