Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/19/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/03/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/15/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/15/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/19/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/31/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/24/2012