Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/23/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/23/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/23/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/23/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/28/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/01/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/07/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 09/07/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/20/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/11/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/14/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/14/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/14/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/14/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/14/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/14/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/14/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/14/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/14/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/14/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/14/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/14/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/14/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/25/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/04/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/18/2012