Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/15/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/15/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/05/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/05/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/31/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/03/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/04/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/04/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/16/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/16/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/16/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/07/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 04/17/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/27/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/18/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/31/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/13/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/19/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 10/09/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/13/2012