Limit your search

1-25 of 223
  1. S.Amdt.1457   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] (Submitted 12/01/2011)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.1455   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/01/2011)
    Cosponsors: 0
  3. S.Amdt.1454   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] (Submitted 11/30/2011)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.1343   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] (Submitted 11/18/2011)
    Cosponsors: 2
  5. S.Amdt.1342   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 11/18/2011)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.1226   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 11/17/2011)
    Cosponsors: 5
  7. S.Amdt.1208   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] (Submitted 11/17/2011)
    Cosponsors: 1
  8. S.Amdt.1191   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] (Submitted 11/17/2011)
    Cosponsors: 0
  9. S.Amdt.1104   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 11/17/2011)
    Cosponsors: 0
  10. S.Amdt.1091 to S.Amdt.957   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 11/17/2011)
    Cosponsors: 0
  11. S.Amdt.1074   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 11/17/2011)
    Cosponsors: 0
  12. S.Amdt.1069 to S.Amdt.957   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 11/17/2011)
    Cosponsors: 5
  13. S.Amdt.1061   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 0
  14. S.Amdt.1060 to S.Amdt.957   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 0
  15. S.Amdt.1059 to S.Amdt.957   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 2
  16. S.Amdt.1058   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 0
  17. S.Amdt.1055   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 0
  18. S.Amdt.1054 to S.Amdt.957   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 1
  19. S.Amdt.1053   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 1
  20. S.Amdt.1052   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 1
  21. S.Amdt.1051   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 1
  22. S.Amdt.1050   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 2
  23. S.Amdt.1049   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 15
  24. S.Amdt.1048 to S.Amdt.957   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 0
  25. S.Amdt.1047   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] (Submitted 11/16/2011)
    Cosponsors: 1