Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/24/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/06/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/08/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/11/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/08/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/26/2012