Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/11/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/11/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/18/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/21/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/22/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/03/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/06/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/18/2012