Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/07/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/07/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/07/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/08/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/23/2011