There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

POWER Act
Providing for Our Workforce and Energy Resources Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

POWER Act
Providing for Our Workforce and Energy Resources Act

Short Titles as Introduced

POWER Act
Providing for Our Workforce and Energy Resources Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act to extend the Constitution, laws, and jurisdiction of the United States to installations and devices attached to the seabed of the Outer Continental Shelf for the production and support of production of energy from sources other than oil and gas, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/07/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 12/05/2011 H8130)
12/01/2011Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-304.
06/24/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
12/08/2011SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
12/07/2011-6:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/07/2011-6:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 12/05/2011 H8130)
12/07/2011-6:16pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8244-8245)
12/05/2011-3:45pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Lujan objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
12/05/2011-3:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2360.
12/05/2011-3:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8130-8131)
12/05/2011-3:39pmHouseMr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/01/2011HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 204.
12/01/2011HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-304.
10/05/2011HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
10/05/2011HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/05/2011HouseSubcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
09/13/2011HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
07/15/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/24/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
06/24/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/24/2011 Referred to
10/05/2011 Markup by
12/01/2011 Reported by H. Rept. 112-304
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources07/15/2011 Referred to
09/13/2011 Hearings by
10/05/2011 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources12/08/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2360.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2360. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/07/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Providing for Our Workforce and Energy Resources Act or POWER Act - Amends the the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act (OCSLA) to extend the Constitution, laws, and civil and political jurisdiction of the United States to installations attached to the seabed of the outer Continental Shelf (OCS) (as under existing law) which may be erected to produce or support production of energy from sources other than oil and gas, as well as to any installation or device (other than a ship or vessel) for transmitting such energy.

Declares that energy leases on the OCS shall be maintained and issued only under the OCSLA.