Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/16/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/08/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/08/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/16/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/20/2012