Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/25/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/25/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/02/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/02/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/02/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/03/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/14/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/05/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/31/2012