Text: H.R.2372 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/24/2011)


112th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 2372


To reduce the amount otherwise available for the payment of salaries and expenses of the Budget Committee and the Office of the Majority Leader of a House of Congress if that House does not adopt a concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 2011 or 2012.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

June 24, 2011

Ms. Buerkle (for herself, Mr. Kinzinger of Illinois, Mr. Hultgren, Mr. Issa, and Mr. Chabot) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on House Administration


A BILL

To reduce the amount otherwise available for the payment of salaries and expenses of the Budget Committee and the Office of the Majority Leader of a House of Congress if that House does not adopt a concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 2011 or 2012.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Just Do Your Job Act of 2011”.

SEC. 2. Findings.

Congress finds the following:

(1) It is the responsibility of each House of Congress to adopt a concurrent resolution on the budget in compliance with the Congressional Budget Act of 1974.

(2) It is the responsibility of the House Majority Leader to schedule legislation in the House of Representatives.

(3) It is the responsibility of the Senate Majority Leader to schedule legislation in the Senate.

(4) The House adopted House Concurrent Resolution 34, the budget resolution for fiscal year 2012, on April 15, 2011, by a vote of 235–193.

(5) The Senate rejected House Concurrent Resolution 34 on May 25, 2011, by a vote of 40–57.

(6) The Senate rejected Senate Concurrent Resolution 18, reflecting the budget submitted by President Obama for fiscal year 2012, on May 25, 2011, by a vote of 0–97.

(7) The Senate last adopted a budget resolution in compliance with the requirements of the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 on April 29, 2009, when it passed Senate Concurrent Resolution 13, the budget resolution for fiscal year 2010, by a vote of 53–43.

SEC. 3. Reduction in amount available for operations of certain offices unless budget resolution adopted.

(a) Prohibition.—Notwithstanding any provision of the Full-Year Continuing Appropriations Act, 2011 (Division B of Public Law 112–10), during the portion of fiscal year 2011 that occurs after the date of the enactment of this Act—

(1) no payment may be made for the salaries and expenses of the Committees on the Budget of the House of Representatives and Senate; and

(2) the amount otherwise made available for the salaries and expenses of the Offices of the Majority Leaders of the House of Representatives and Senate shall each be reduced by $1,000,000.

(b) Exception.—If a House of Congress has adopted a concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 2011 or fiscal year 2012 that complies with section 301(a)(1–7) and section 301(e)(2)(A–F) of the Congressional Budget Act of 1974, subsection (a) shall not apply to the Committee on the Budget or the Office of the Majority Leader of that House.