Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/07/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/28/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/28/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/28/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/28/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/28/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/28/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/01/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 08/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 08/30/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/22/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/02/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/19/2012