Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/27/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/20/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/21/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/29/2012