Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/07/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/15/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/17/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/17/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/05/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/11/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/18/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/19/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/19/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 07/19/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/26/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/01/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 08/02/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/12/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/14/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/14/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/19/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/19/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/09/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/09/2012