Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/09/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/07/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/07/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/07/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/07/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/07/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/07/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 11/30/2011