Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 10/04/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/04/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/18/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/18/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/01/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/11/2012