Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/08/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/08/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 07/11/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/11/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/11/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/11/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/11/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/12/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/12/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/13/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/13/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/14/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/14/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/14/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/14/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/14/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/15/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/18/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/18/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/19/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/20/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/20/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 07/21/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/22/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/22/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/25/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/25/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/27/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 08/09/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 08/01/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 08/01/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 08/01/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 08/01/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 09/14/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/20/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/20/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/20/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/20/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/20/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/20/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/21/2012