Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/08/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/11/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/20/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/09/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/04/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/26/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/27/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/03/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/03/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/03/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/15/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 11/15/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 11/15/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/18/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/29/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/06/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/08/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/12/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/12/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/12/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/15/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/15/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/23/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/10/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/17/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/17/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/25/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/31/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/01/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/09/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/14/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/30/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/16/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/16/2012