Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/15/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 07/15/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/15/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/15/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/15/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/15/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/15/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 07/15/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/15/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/15/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/15/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/15/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/15/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/15/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/15/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/15/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/15/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/15/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/15/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/15/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/15/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/15/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/15/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/15/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/19/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/19/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/19/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/19/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 07/19/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/19/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/19/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/19/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/19/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/19/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/19/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/19/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/19/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/19/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/19/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/19/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/19/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 07/19/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/19/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/19/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/19/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/19/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/19/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/19/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/19/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/19/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/22/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/22/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/22/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 08/01/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/01/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 09/13/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/20/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/01/2011