Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 07/06/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/11/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/07/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/13/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/14/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 10/26/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/08/2011