Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/08/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/12/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/14/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 10/11/2011