Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/12/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/12/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/07/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/07/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/06/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 10/31/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/24/2012