Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/15/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/20/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/22/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/03/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/03/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/04/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/04/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 10/05/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/05/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/13/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/13/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/13/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/27/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/27/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/27/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/02/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 11/04/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 11/17/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/17/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 12/06/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/07/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/19/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/27/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/27/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/27/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/19/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/19/2012