Refine your search

8 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
12/04/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-201.
12/04/2012 Signed by President.
11/28/2012 Presented to President.
11/15/2012 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 370 - 19 (Roll no. 607).(consideration: CR H6390-6391; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 11/14/2012 H6352)
09/22/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 9/21/2012 S6671)
09/22/2012 Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/18/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 4, 2 Present (Roll no. 171).(text: CR 4/17/2012 H1824)
07/07/2011 Introduced in House