Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/01/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 12/06/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/06/2011